Accounts and annual returns GIRL - INDIA

Charity number: 1120540
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 25 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 13 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2015 21 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required