Trustees ST THOMAS' INDIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH LONDON

Charity Number: 1118820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Anoop Malayil Chair 01 February 2022
None on record
Shelvin Kuriakose Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
ANIL ABRAHAM Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Vibin Babu Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Shiji Paul Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Jisa Alex Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Suja Sajan Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Binu Cherian Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Binson John Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Daliya Thomas Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Saiju Varghese Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Libu Abraham Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Charls Raju Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Ajai Sam Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Cijine John Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
SHIBU PAUL Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record