Financial history THE SKANSEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1118909
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012
Total gross income £96.14k £90.80k £24.51k £34.74k £2.83k
Total expenditure £54.20k £130.87k £5.73k £38.96k £19.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A