Financial history JOEL OSTEEN MINISTRIES UK

Charity number: 1119836
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £59.39k £111.22k £126.55k £155.42k £129.52k
Total expenditure £63.10k £52.03k £61.10k £61.58k £66.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0