Financial history THE FRIENDS OF BISHOP PARKER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1119888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.74k £1.05k £480 £6.05k £7.59k
Total expenditure £4.99k £396 £118 £4.60k £6.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A