Financial history WORLD RELIEF MISSION

Charity number: 1119130
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £1.86m £1.12m £833.72k £550.83k £1.08m
Total expenditure £2.24m £1.07m £784.80k £610.94k £1.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.81m £1.09m £815.25k £513.89k £1.02m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £53.85k £34.88k £18.47k £36.93k £60.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.48m £774.40k £633.70k £432.50k £871.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £22.10k £28.56k £25.01k £24.90k £16.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £533.26k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0