Financial history OUTREACH & EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity Number: 1119921
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.09k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A