Accounts and annual returns SEEING HANDS NEPAL

Charity number: 1120429
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 06 April 2017 23 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2016 09 April 2017 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2015 01 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2015 Not Required