Financial history BROAD OAK SERVICES

Charity number: 1122774
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £30.47k £30.58k £31.01k £35.48k £32.03k
Total expenditure £29.64k £25.16k £29.60k £35.32k £33.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A