Accounts and annual returns TRUST YOUTH

Charity number: 1119585
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2011 08 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2010 27 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2009 03 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2009 03 August 2010 On Time