Financial history THE CROWLE WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1119179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £29.98k £22.02k £31.99k £41.87k £24.70k
Total expenditure £13.87k £14.19k £16.06k £1.51m £7.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A