Accounts and annual returns House of Imagination

Charity Number: 1122010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 05 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 15 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window