Accounts and annual returns ENABLE 2 COPE

Charity number: 1120464
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 02 April 2012 21 March 2013 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2011 04 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2010 10 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2010 Not Required