Accounts and annual returns MANCHESTER LIBERAL JEWISH COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1120548
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 December 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 August 2022 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 26 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required