Accounts and annual returns HAMILTON SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required