Accounts and annual returns WOMENS DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1121148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2024 21 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2023 21 February 2025 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2022 21 February 2025 631 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2021 21 February 2025 996 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2020 18 April 2022 321 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 Not Required