Financial history THE SUSSEX HEART CHARITY

Charity Number: 1120998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £175.76k £737.26k £366.15k £95.14k £166.66k
Total expenditure £370.19k £145.59k £183.99k £181.67k £198.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £727.82k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.68k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £7.76k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £649.97k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £107.28k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £38.31k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.52k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £4.53k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A