Trustees THE PILSDON AT MALLING COMMUNITY
Charity number: 1123682

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Camilla Medhurst | Chair | 09 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Ashworth | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Anne Rodwell | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Rosemary Rink | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sister Susan Mary Ives OSB | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip George Combs | Trustee | 05 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Noel Margaret Jordan | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Brian Ross Young | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Richards | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE MARY SMYTH | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.