Financial history BRYNTIRION AND LALESTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1122146
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £9.62k £8.27k £10.51k £9.52k £7.70k
Total expenditure £9.31k £7.47k £8.12k £7.49k £9.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.34k N/A N/A