Accounts and annual returns HOLMER PRE-SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 1120276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 08 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 03 July 2024 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 03 July 2024 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 September 2023 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 05 September 2023 97 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 June 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 17 June 2022 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 September 2021 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 September 2021 102 days late Download Open in new window