Financial history UPPER GI BLUES

Charity Number: 1124418
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.20k £26.68k £13.17k £6.45k £9.09k
Total expenditure £12.93k £14.08k £53.60k £17.15k £1.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A