Accounts and annual returns ANTIGONE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1120554
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 30 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 21 April 2015 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 21 April 2015 172 days late
Annual return 31 December 2012 21 April 2015 537 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 21 April 2015 537 days late
Annual return 31 December 2011 21 April 2015 902 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 21 April 2015 902 days late