Financial history LIGHT AIRCRAFT ASSOCIATION EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1121986
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £16.97k £13.15k £12.46k £109.82k £7.00k
Total expenditure £15.09k £17.87k £14.85k £40.99k £8.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A