Trustees FRIENDS OF EPINAY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1123979

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE MCGLEN | Chair | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Emma Price | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Rue | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Arnold | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY HUNTLEY | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEREK HUNTLEY | Trustee | 13 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANNE MOUNTAIN | Trustee | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH DUNN | Trustee | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.