Financial history BHANJI AND BHANUMATI RANIGA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1120040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.50k £323.40k £27.50k £37.30k £43.50k
Total expenditure £1.20k £1.50k £1.56k £7.56k £17.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A