Accounts and annual returns WOODSETTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1120126
Charity reporting is overdue by 1067 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 702 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 702 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1067 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1067 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 March 2022 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required