Accounts and annual returns CRAWLEY AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1124728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 September 2023 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window