Accounts and annual returns THE KING'S CHAMBER

Charity Number: 1123993
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2011 17 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2010 10 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2009 22 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 Not Required