Financial history THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF SKIN CAMOUFLAGE

Charity number: 1123059
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £27.68k £33.68k £4.81k £10.11k £55.68k
Total expenditure £30.83k £32.74k £8.47k £11.24k £67.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A