Accounts and annual returns CYLCH CYFANSWADD GRANGETOWN A'R BAE

Charity Number: 1121733
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 February 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 February 2019 5 days late