Accounts and annual returns BIRTLEY COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1120702
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 23 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 23 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2008 26 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 26 December 2008 On Time