Financial history JESHUA UNIT SOCIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1121981
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £14.47k £10.32k £28.63k £45.05k £369.23k
Total expenditure £14.38k £10.30k £28.04k £42.52k £363.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0