Financial history HUNGRY CHILDREN PROJECT

Charity Number: 1120940
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2010 30/04/2011 30/04/2012 30/04/2013 30/04/2014
Total gross income £135.89k £1.15m £379.05k £1.56m £430.98k
Total expenditure £255.06k £1.24m £375.13k £1.63m £388.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.15m N/A £1.56m N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £74 N/A £44 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.24m N/A £1.61m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £7.54k N/A £19.87k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £22.73k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A