Financial history THE NAKED HEART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.30m £71.13k £15.85k £11.48k £5.48k
Total expenditure £2.06m £870.24k £438.54k £329.82k £323.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £200.19k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £4.09m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £412 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.33m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £731.77k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £47.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A