Financial history Vita New Hope

Charity Number: 1122262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £38.19k £42.35k £118.34k £20.21k £146.49k
Total expenditure £49.90k £45.42k £86.17k £54.96k £115.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.16k £31.77k £3.25k N/A N/A