Accounts and annual returns QUEENIE'S CHRISTMAS CHARITY

Charity number: 1121685
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 January 2020 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required