Accounts and annual returns ETHNIC ACCESS LINK

Charity number: 1124478
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 16 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 29 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 02 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 09 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 21 January 2010 On Time