Governing document AG BELL INTERNATIONAL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 APRIL 2009 AND 9 NOVEMBER 2009. NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
1.1 TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PREVENTION AND MITIGATION OF DEAFNESS AND HEARING IMPAIRMENT AND THE BETTER TREATMENT, EDUCATION, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND WELFARE OF PEOPLE WHO ARE HEARING IMPAIRED (BENEFICIARIES) AND GENERALLY TO PROMOTE, SAFEGUARD AND PROTECT THE WELFARE OF BENEFICIARIES THROUGH THE TREATMENT OF AND THE PROVISION OF SERVICES TO BENEFICIARIES AND THEIR FAMILIES WITH SPECIAL BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE EMPHASIS ON THE SITUATION OF BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE RESIDENT IN SPAIN AND OTHER SPANISH SPEAKING COUNTRIES; AND 1.2 TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING GRANTS. 2. NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.