Trustees MASS EXTINCTION MONITORING OBSERVATORY
Charity number: 1122701
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Mary Marsh | Chair | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raina Summerson | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Murphy | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Moore | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tim Smit | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUE LYONS | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CLIVE MATTHEWS | Trustee | 13 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIR GHILLEAN PRANCE FRS VMH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.