Accounts and annual returns ORPHAN VILLAGE AFRICA LTD

Charity number: 1122335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 July 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 September 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required