Financial history WELLS EVENING SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1124321
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015
Total gross income £7.75k £6.90k £21.32k £22.92k £15.60k
Total expenditure £5.74k £7.93k £28.09k £21.39k £15.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0