Financial history CIRENCESTER CYBER CAFE

Charity number: 1122582
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012
Total gross income £14.61k £23.39k £25.16k £20.81k £17.29k
Total expenditure £15.53k £22.04k £21.88k £25.37k £18.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A