Financial history HARLOW TEAM ACTIVITY GROUP (HTAG)

Charity number: 1124101
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £7.03k £20.20k £15.22k £2.46k £1.86k
Total expenditure £5.35k £13.13k £13.49k £9.47k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A