Accounts and annual returns NEW FORDLEY JUNIORS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1121947
Charity reporting is up to date (129 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 July 2023 20 September 2024 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2023 20 September 2024 129 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 July 2022 12 June 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2022 12 June 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 July 2021 11 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2021 11 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 July 2020 05 November 2021 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2020 05 November 2021 175 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 July 2019 08 June 2020 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2019 08 June 2020 25 days late Download Open in new window