Accounts and annual returns CYLCH MEITHRIN Y SEGR

Charity number: 1122367
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 March 2025 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 March 2025 407 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2025 730 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2025 730 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2023 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2023 364 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 June 2021 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 June 2021 137 days late Download Open in new window