Accounts and annual returns THE SANDRA SORRELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1121938
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 December 2016 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 26 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required