Accounts and annual returns CULTURE : UNLIMITED

Charity number: 1123928
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 12 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 04 April 2012 64 days late
Annual return 31 July 2010 26 October 2011 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 18 August 2011 79 days late
Annual return 31 July 2009 27 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required