Financial history THE UP FRANKIE HOWERD OBE CARRY ON WAVERING DOWN HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1122850
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £40 £1.11k £33.49k £1.97k
Total expenditure £14 £76 £1.68k £12.11k £14.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A