Financial history DEAN FARM TRUST

Charity Number: 1122303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £225.14k £290.11k £296.92k £279.29k £326.46k
Total expenditure £241.51k £226.55k £291.63k £315.19k £297.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.64k
Income from government grants N/A £5.68k N/A £4.61k £4.64k