Financial history ONE CAUSE LIMITED

Charity number: 1123183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £50.34k £33.25k £57.67k £79.93k £109.59k
Total expenditure £55.44k £51.75k £86.57k £46.98k £123.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A